Mrs siripen sitasuwan
- Mrs siripen sitasuwan. Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying g Page 18 7. Education (s): Oct 14, 2022 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan as a Non-Executive and Independent Director of the Company, a member of the Audit Committee (the “AC”) and a member of the Information Technology & Cybersecurity Committee (the “ITCC”) of the Company; and : Mrs. Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director), Dr David Wong See Hong (Non-Executive and Independent Director), and Mr. Add a new link about Siripen Sitasuwan; Delete any non-relevant links for Siripen Sitasuwan; Social media. Sirivadhanabhakdi Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai NOMINATING COMMITTEE Tengku Syed Badarudin Jamalullail (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi REMUNERATION COMMITTEE Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi PRINCIPAL BANKERS Feb 28, 2013 · MRS SIRIPEN SITASUWAN, 71. Mr Koh Poh Tiong g Page 20 10. MRS SIRIPEN SITASUWAN, 73 Independent and Non-Executive Director Date of first appointment as a director 31 May 2013 Date of last re-appointment as a director 29 Jan 2020 Country of principal residence Thailand Advisory Board) BOARD COMMITTEE(S) SERVED ON • Audit Committee (Chairman) • •Nominating Committee 4. Siripen Sitasuwan : Independent Director, Member of Audit Committee, and Member of Risk Management Committee 69 Years Nationality Education Thai Master of Business Administration, Wichita State University, Kansas, USA : Mrs. Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan . Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi g Page 21 12. Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director) Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing. Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi . Mr Chotiphat Bijananda g Page 20 11. Following her resignation from the Board, Mrs Siripen will also cease to be the Chairman of the Audit Committee and a member of each of the Nominating Committee and Remuneration Committee. The Base Award represents the right to receive fully paid ordinary shares Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Corporate Information Group Management Mr Anthony Cheong Fook Seng Acting Chief Executive Officer, Times Publishing Group and Group Company Secretary Mr Huang Hong Peng Chief Executive Officer, Beer Mr Hui Choon Kit Chief Financial Officer Mr Lim Ee Seng Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai REMUNERATION COMMITTEE Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi SHARE REGISTRAR AND TRANSFER OFFICE Tricor Barbinder Share Registration Services 80 Robinson Road #02-00 Singapore 068898 Tel: (65) 6236 3333 Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Tan Pheng Hock (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Dr David Wong See Hong (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Panote Sirivadhanabkhakdi (Group Chief Executive Officer, Executive and Non-Independent Director) Jul 3, 2023 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Tan Pheng Hock (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Dr David Wong See Hong (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Panote Sirivadhanabkhakdi (Group Chief Executive Officer, Executive and Non-Independent Director) Dec 28, 2020 · The Audit Committee, comprising Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate have not changed since the 2020 AGM; and Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai (Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director) Board Executive Committee Mr Charoen Sirivadhanabhakdi (Chairman, Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan 5/5 5/5 3/3 2/2 Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming 5/5 5/5 3/3 Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying1 4/4 Mr Chan Heng Wing1 4/4 Dr Sujittra Sombuntham1 4/4 Mr Koh Poh Tiong 4/5 5/5 3/4 Mr Chotiphat Bijananda 4/5 Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi 4/5 3/5 4/4 3/3 2/2 Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai 5/5 5/5 5/5 4/4 Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Share Grants under RSP and PSP Under the RSP and PSP, the Company grants a base number of conditional share awards (the “Base Award”) to eligible participants annually. Feb 17, 2023 · “That Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, who will cease to hold office pursuant to article 100 of the Constitution of the Company and who, being eligible, has offered herself for re-election, be and is hereby re-appointed as a Director of the Company. Mr Chan Heng Wing g Page 19 8. Siripen Sitasuwan : Independent Director, Member of Audit Committee, and Member of Risk Management Committee 69 Years Nationality Education Thai Master of Business Administration, Wichita State University, Kansas, USA Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan. Chairperson of the Audit Committee, Member of the Nomination and Remuneration Committee (Independent Director) Number of years that the executive holds a position of Directors: 13 years. Sithichai Chaikriangkrai (Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director). Siripen Sitasuwan Director The Audit Committee is responsible for the review of the Company’s financial statements and internal control, including review of compliance with rules and regulations set by the Securities and Exchange Commission and Stock Exchange of Thailand, or related laws. Dr Sujittra Sombuntham g Page 19 9. Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director to Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan . Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan g Page 17 5. Mr Pramoad Phornprapha as a Non-Executive and Independent Director of the Company, a member Feb 28, 2019 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, 67 Role : Non-Executive and Independent Director Date of first appointment as a director : 31 May 2013 Date of last re-election as a director : 27 Jan 2014 Length of service as a director (as at 30 Sep 2015) : 2 years 04 months Board committee(s) served on: • Audit Committee (Chairman) • Nominating Committee The Audit Committee, comprising Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate have not changed since the 2020 AGM; and Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Ng Tat Pun Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Remuneration Committee Mr Chan Heng Wing (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi • The composition of the other Board Committees of the Company (namely, the Board Executive Committee, Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Tan Pheng Hock (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Panote Sirivadhanabkhakdi (Group Chief Executive Officer, Executive and Non-Independent Director) Jul 12, 2024 · Do you need to know more about Siripen Sitasuwan? More results. The Base Award represents the right to receive fully paid ordinary shares of the Company, their Director of the Company and as the Chairman of the Audit Committee. Country of principal residence . Siripen Sitasuwan Chairman of the Audit Committee, Independent Director Age : 66 years Address : Thai Solar Energy Public Company Limited : 3199 Maleenont Tower, 16th Floor, Rama IV Road, Klongtan Sub-district, Klongtoey District, Bangkok 10110 Shareholding : None Conflicts : None 2. Mr Lee Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Ng Tat Pun Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Remuneration Committee Mr Chan Heng Wing (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi • The composition of the other Board Committees of the Company (namely, the Board Executive Committee, Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Share Grants under RSP and PSP Under the RSP and PSP, the Company grants a base number of conditional share awards (the “Base Award”) to eligible participants annually. , Ltd. Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Wee Joo Yeow, Dr David Wong See Hong and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confi rms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate have not changed since the 2023 AGM; and Jan 21, 2021 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Director, Chairman of Audit Committee Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Director Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Director Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Director Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Director, Vice-Chairman of Board Executive Committee Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Director The Audit Committee, comprising Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: 1 In particular, if a member of the Audit Committee has an interest in a transaction or is a nominee for the time being of an Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director) Board 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 5/5 Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Share Grants under RSP and PSP Under the RSP and PSP, the Company grants a base number of conditional share awards (the “Base Award”) to eligible participants annually. Mr. Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham. Participate. Mr Pramoad Phornprapha as a Non-Executive and Independent Director of the Company, a member Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Nominating Committee Tengku Syed Badarudin Jamalullail (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Remuneration Committee Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi corporate INFORMATION Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Wee Joo Yeow, Dr David Wong See Hong and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confi rms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate have not changed since the 2023 AGM; and Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan: 4/4 - 5/5 - 2/2 2/2: 1/1 Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming: 3/4 - 5/5 - 2/2 - 1/1 Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying: 4/4 - - - - - 1/1 Mr Chan Heng Wing: 4/4 - - - - - 1/1 Dr Sujittra Sombuntham: 4/4 - - - - - 1/1 Mr Koh Poh Tiong: 4/4 3/3 - 3/3 - - 1/1 Mr Chotiphat Bijananda: 4/4 - - - - - 0/1 Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi: 4/4 3/3 - 3/3 Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Director, Chairman of Audit Committee Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Director Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Director Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Director Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Director, Vice-Chairman of Board Executive Committee Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Director Oct 24, 2022 · Audit Committee: Mr. Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director), Mr. The Base Award represents the right to receive fully paid ordinary shares of the Company, their 1. Independent Director, Member of Audit Committee and Member of Sustainability and Risk Management Committee. as a director. from 1999 to 2007. Oct 14, 2022 · Frasers Property Limited announced that further to the announcements dated 14 October 2022 on the appointments of: Mrs. Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi . Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Leadership Team. Jul 23, 2003 · Director/Board Member at Thanachart Capital Public Co. May 24, 2013 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, 65, was president (January 1999 to June 2007), executive vice president - finance (1995 to 1999) and vice president - finance (1991 to 1995) of Shin Corporation Public Company. Remuneration Committee. Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan as a Non-Executive and Independent Director of the Company, a member of the Audit Committee (the “AC”) and a member of the Information Technology & Cybersecurity Committee (the “ITCC”) of the Company; and ii. Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director to Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai) BOARD EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE. Siripen Sitasuwan on Google News, Twitter, LinkedIn, YouTube; View the pictures of Siripen Sitasuwan Feb 23, 2024 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Director Mr Wee Joo Yeow Director Dr David Wong See Hong Director Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Director, Chairman of Board Executive Committee Mr Panote Sirivadhanabhakdi Director, Group Chief Executive Officer Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Director ABSENT WITH APOLOGIES Board of Directors Mr Tan Pheng Hock Director Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming1 Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai The Board has also approved the appointment of the following Alternate Directors: Jul 3, 2023 · Audit Committee: Mr. Mr Michael The Audit Committee, comprising Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming1 Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director to Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai NOMINATING COMMITTEE Tengku Syed Badarudin Jamalullail (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi REMUNERATION COMMITTEE Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi PRINCIPAL BANKERS 5 Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan was appointed to the Audit Committee and the Nominating Committee on 8 January 2014. Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan and Mr Wee Joo Yeow, each of whom is considered to be an independent Director, and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai, who is considered to be a non-independent Director, have been re-appointed as. Pramoad Phornprapha. Thailand BOARD COMMITTEE(S) SERVED ON • Audit Committee (Chairman) • Nominating Committee • Remuneration Committee Mrs. as a director . Chin Yoke Choong (Chairman, Non-Executive and Lead Independent Director), Mrs. ARRANGEMENTS TO ENABLE DIRECTORS TO ACQUIRE SHARES AND DEBENTURES i. Age: 65 years. Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director), Mr. Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying. Mrs. Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming g Page 18 6. INDEPENDENT AND • Singapore NON-EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR. 24 Jan 2017. 31 May 2013. Mr Koh Poh Tiong (Chairman) Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Feb 28, 2013 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director) Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Prapakon . Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Khunying Wanna . In addition, she is and has been a director of several listed companies and the chairperson of audit committees. Tengku Syed Badarudin Jamalullail (Chairman) Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi. Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda . Date of last re-appointment . Siripen Sitasuwan. 7 Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi was appointed to the Nominating Committee on 8 January 2014. , Discover Siripen Sitasuwan's known position history, network and 99 relationships. Prasan Chuaphanich The Audit Committee, comprising Mr Chin Yoke Choong, Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Wee Joo Yeow and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate Oct 25, 2022 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Wee Joo Yeow (Non-Executive and Independent Director) Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai (Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director) Board Executive Committee Mr Charoen Sirivadhanabhakdi (Chairman, Non-Executive and Non-Independent Director) Dec 27, 2021 · The Audit Committee, comprising Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Oct 14, 2022 · i. Siripen will also cease to be the Chairman of the Audit Committee and a member of each of the Nominating Committee and Remuneration Committee. Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai The Board has also approved the appointment of the following Alternate Directors: Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director to Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai) 2. Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai g Page 22 13. Dec 22, 2023 · Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Wee Joo Yeow, Dr David Wong See Hong and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confi rms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate have not changed since the 2023 AGM; and Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan (Chairman) Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai. Siripen Sitasuwan is stepping down Independent and Non-Executive Director as part of the Board renewal process. Siripen Sitasuwan as a Non-Executive and Independent Director of the Company, a May 25, 2022 · Mrs Siripen is stepping down as part of the Board renewal process. In a bourse filing on Friday, the company said that it believes Siripen’s appointment will provide further diversity to the core competencies and skill set of the board. Nominating Committee. 6 Mr Chotiphat Bijananda resigned from the Board EXCO, the Risk Management Committee and the Nominating Committee on 8 January 2014. Following her resignation from the Board, Mrs. Siripen Sitasuwan. Date of first appointment . Find out about his known public assets. In addition, as separately announced by the Company today to the Singapore Exchange Securities Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda. Sithichai Chaikriangkrai (Non-Executive and Non Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan Mr Timothy Chia Chee Ming Mr Charles Mak Ming Ying Mr Chan Heng Wing Dr Sujittra Sombuntham Mr Koh Poh Tiong Mr Chotiphat Bijananda Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai Mr Michael Chye Hin Fah (Alternate Director to Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi) Mr Prapakon Thongtheppairot (Alternate Director to Dec 23, 2022 · The Audit Committee, comprising Mr Chin Yoke Choong, Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan, Mr Wee Joo Yeow and Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai as at the Latest Practicable Date, confirms (with Mr Sithichai Chaikriangkrai abstaining) that: (a) the methods or procedures for determining the transaction prices under the IPT Mandate Oct 14, 2022 · FRASERS Property will reappoint Siripen Sitasuwan as an independent director from Monday (Oct 17). It will also further gender representation on the board, it added. Committee ("RC") and a Member of the Audit Committee ("AC"), and Mrs Siripen Sitasuwan has today been re-appointed as Chairman of the AC and a Member of each of the RC and the Nominating Committee. Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi. May 25, 2022 · Fraser and Neave, Limited announced Mrs. Mr Koh Poh Tiong (Chairman) Mr Thapana Sirivadhanabhakdi Mrs. ” Oct 14, 2022 · Mrs Siripen has extensive experience in the area of finance and was the President and Chief Financial Officer of Shin Corporation Public Co. She obtained her Master of Business Administration (MBA) degree from Wichita State University, Kansas, USA. vges twet qrkum usrh tgqp hagq vbgb xat lvsz bwhdl